Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na Successor By Merger To Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association Successor By Merger To First Union Home Equity Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against City Of Cortland, John Doe Richard Roe Jane Doe Cora Coe Dick Moe And Ruby Poe, Kristen Monroe As Commissioner Of The County Department Of Social Services, Shirley J Prentice, represented by Banewicz, Stacy L, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time361 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 08, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: January 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: January 30, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - b
Date: January 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 29, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: January 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2016 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 04, 2016 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 04, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b filed lis pendens |
||
January 04, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a filed summons |
||
February 19, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/shirley j. prentice |
||
January 30, 2015 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
January 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/city of cortland |
||
January 29, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service/kristen monroe, as commissioner of the cortland county department of social services |
||
January 08, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
January 08, 2015 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.