Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Srp 2012-4, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Falkowski, Michal, Paykin, Alexander, Richland, Daniel H., against Jack Cochis, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Molly Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMolly Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management985 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1050 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1076 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 27, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2017 | Notice of Entry and Judgment | ||
November 28, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
November 20, 2017 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 19, 2017 | Bill of Costs | ||
November 19, 2017 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment |
||
November 09, 2017 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 09, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED FITZGERALD (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MOLLY R. FITZGERALD |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FITZGERALD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MOLLY R. FITZGERALD |
|
November 02, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affirmation of Service |
||
November 02, 2017 |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2) Bill of Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.