Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, against Bank One, Na, Casey Monahan A K A Casey A. Monahan A K A Casey Russell A K A Casey A. Russell, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The, National Direct Equity, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time674 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 22, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2016 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT RESTORATION CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 22, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 22, 2016 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 22, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2016 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 22, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 09/23/2016GRANTED-SIGNED Before Justice: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 22, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.