Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
New York State Department Of Environmental Conservation, State Of New York, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by , Kowalczyk, Joseph Michael, Lusignan, Brian Murray, against James C. Stevens Iii, represented by Benjamin, Ronald R, Ross, Joel Ian, Shafer, R Michael, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Tait Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management269 days |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 18, 2014ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: December 12, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 14, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 01, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #-2)
Date: September 16, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 12, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 04, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 08, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 15, 2017PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 05, 2017ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #11)
Date: September 11, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 14, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 10, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #-2)
Date: October 20, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 25, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 18, 2014ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 22, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: February 03, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 12, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 18, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 02, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 26, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 05, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #9)
Date: April 07, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #-2)
Date: October 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 18, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 20, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 16, 2017ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: April 26, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 14, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 28, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 12, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 16, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 24, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 09, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: February 01, 2016ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: February 07, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 17, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 19, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 01, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 09, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 12, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: April 02, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #-2)
Date: October 22, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 03, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 31, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 05, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 01, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 16, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 12, 2017SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 12, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 01, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 25, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 12, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 02, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 02, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #12)
Date: October 05, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 27, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 18, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #13)
Date: April 18, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 13, 2017ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 29, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 19, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 04, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 02, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: April 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 09, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 13, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 09, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #14)
Date: January 09, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 01, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 08, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 16, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 05, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 02, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 09, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #11)
Date: August 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #-2)
Date: September 16, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: August 23, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: September 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #-2)
Date: September 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #4)
Date: February 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 21, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 27, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 28, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #10)
Date: April 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 18, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 11, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 05, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 27, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 12, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 28, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 16, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 28, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: September 29, 2017PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 26, 2017SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 12, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 01, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 09, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 18, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 21, 2017PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 04, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 02, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 10, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 25, 2017PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 04, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2014ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: December 23, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 02, 2020 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE MASLER (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JEFFREY A. TAIT |
|
April 02, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 01, 2019 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 28, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE TAIT (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JEFFREY A. TAIT |
|
February 26, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE TAIT (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JEFFREY A. TAIT |
|
February 04, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service with Notice of Entry |
||
February 01, 2019 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 30, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #0013) TAIT (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JEFFREY A. TAIT |
|
January 29, 2019 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #14) Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.