Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cassar, James Joseph, Jurek, Amber Augustine, Mulvey, Michael Brendon, Polowy, Amy E., against John Doe, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Nicole E. Bull, Timothy E. Bull, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management624 days |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions420 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time421 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 27, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 13, 2014ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: September 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CAMPBELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
June 06, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
February 03, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 08, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
January 08, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
January 07, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
January 07, 2016 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
January 07, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
October 27, 2015 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 27, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1X) cost of plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.