Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Gertrude B. Grant, James M. Grant, John Doe, Mary Doe, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions729 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time729 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 26, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 04, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 15, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 12, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 04, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2014AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit I VESTING DEED.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016OATH Â (Motion #2) Referee's Oath Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 09, 2016AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit E 90 DAY.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit C ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit A NOTE.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit G AFF OF SERVICE.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit D 30 DAY.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit H ANSWER.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 04, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2014REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 20, 2017FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: May 03, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: June 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 13, 2015ASSIGNED RJI
Date: September 21, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) MSJ Exhibit B MORTGAGE.pdf Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 11, 2015BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 03, 2016BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 02, 2016JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: November 03, 2016ANSWER
Date: October 26, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 09, 2016ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2014ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 11, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2017 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
May 03, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
April 28, 2017 | Hearing |
CAMPBELL (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
January 20, 2017 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
January 20, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 03, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
November 03, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 02, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
November 02, 2016 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (AMENDED) | ||
November 02, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.