Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deustsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For The Mlmi Trust Series 2007-Mln1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against American General Home Equity Inc., Beneficial Homeowner Service Corporation, Cortland Reginal Medical Center Inc., Cynthia Horton, John Doe, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time731 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2016 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 03, 2016 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 03, 2016 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
November 01, 2016 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Status inquiry |
||
July 25, 2015 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
July 25, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOE OOR filed |
||
July 25, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT NOE aff of mailing |
||
July 25, 2015 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE |
||
June 24, 2015 | ORDER - REFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.