Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington Development Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Tooher, Meave Marie Gabrielle, against Alfred Weissman Real Estate, Llc, Department Of Planning, Housing & Community Development For The City Of Binghamton, Hawley Street Members, Llc, Office Of Building Construction, Zoning And Code Enforcement For The City Of Binghamton, Planning Commission Of The City Of Binghamton, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2014 |
CategoryArticle 78 Proceedings |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions124 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Case Cycle Time154 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 09, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 05, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 12, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
March 12, 2015 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 12, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 19, 2015 | Notice of Entry - Amended Decision, Order and Judgment | ||
February 10, 2015 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Amended Decision, Order and Judgment |
||
February 10, 2015 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Cover letter with explanation of amendment to decision |
||
February 10, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
February 09, 2015 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Letter to Clerk for Decision and Order |
||
February 09, 2015 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision and Order |
||
February 09, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.