Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bebirian, Nicholas John, Briant-Napier, Anita Kay, Greenbaum, Daniel Grant, Katz, Jordan S, Modica, Tyne Regina, (total of 6) See All against Bridgette Sherman Aka Bridgette F. Sherman, Jane Doe, John Doe, Troy Sherman Aka Troy M. Sherman, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Molly Fitzgerald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMolly Fitzgerald Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1721 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1717 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 07, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
August 10, 2020 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 19, 2020 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
February 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
February 07, 2020 | NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
June 10, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 10, 2019 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FITZGERALD (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MOLLY R. FITZGERALD |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) FITZGERALD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MOLLY R. FITZGERALD |
|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) FITZGERALD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MOLLY R. FITZGERALD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.