Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
K-Mart #7134, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Cortlandville Town, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2014 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Case Cycle Time833 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 14, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 24, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2016 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 24, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
October 24, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
August 15, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
July 29, 2014 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 17, 2014 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Abeyance Letter to Petition |
||
July 14, 2014 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 14, 2014 |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL Conformed RJI |
||
July 14, 2014 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Schedule Notice |
||
July 14, 2014 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.