Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sheereen Rafik, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ahmed, Usman, against Romeo Fr Ram, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 04, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
March 21, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
March 21, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
December 30, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
December 29, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
December 29, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
December 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 29, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.