Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shengxiao Weng, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Barnett, Keith Scott, against Dandan Chen, Dan Dan Chen, represented by Kroner, Eugene, Wong, Vincent S., in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 08, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
November 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 18, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
November 04, 2021 | REGISTRY CHECK RESULTS | ||
November 04, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
November 02, 2021 | STIPULATION TO AMEND CAPTION | ||
November 02, 2021 | UCS - 111 | ||
November 02, 2021 | SUPPORT COLLECTION UNIT INFORMATION SHEET | ||
November 02, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.