Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cooper Mr, Mortgage Ll Nationstar, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Caster, Austin Robert, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, against Cortland County Clerk, Patricia F Durkee, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Contract (Non-Commercial)) |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY REQUEST |
||
January 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 23, 2021 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
October 26, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Service Affidavits |
||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
||
October 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
October 25, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit |
||
October 08, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
October 06, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Assignment of Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.