Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Shawn Cooley, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 11, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 14, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
July 21, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
July 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 11, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q39690150527 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.