Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jarrett D Regard, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Haddad, Laurin R., against Valerie E Regard, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
November 29, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
November 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
November 19, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
November 19, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
November 18, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
August 24, 2021 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
August 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.