Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sergio Rafael Velasquez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Olga Lydia Velasquez, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time113 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY REQUEST |
||
August 21, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY REQUEST |
||
March 08, 2019 | Notice of Entry with Judgement Attached | ||
March 08, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of JOD |
||
January 18, 2019 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 18, 2019 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
January 18, 2019 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 18, 2019 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
November 23, 2018 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
November 23, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.