Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tinu Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Langey, John Robert, Walsh, Terance Vincent, against City Of Cortland, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin M Dowd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin M Dowd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Municipal Fee Dispute) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time266 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 15, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 15, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 18, 2016 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
October 13, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED DOWD (Court Activity) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
October 13, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
June 10, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
June 06, 2016 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
May 11, 2016 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Adj.Request Granted-motion return 6/10/16 |
||
April 28, 2016 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Motion adj.to 5/13/16 at Norwich |
||
April 27, 2016 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Judicial Assignment Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.