Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Fremont Home Loan Trust 2006-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Munian, Victoria Elizabeth, against Chesapeake Appalachia, Llc, Cortland Regional Medical Center Inc., John Doe, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Statoil Usa Onshore Properties, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by , Spinner, Mark David, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time666 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 09, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 09, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 09, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 14, 2015ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 10, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 27, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 04, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 05, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 27, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 14, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 04, 2015ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 09, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 14, 2015ASSIGNED RJI
Date: March 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2017 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
March 10, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
March 10, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
March 10, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
March 09, 2017 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 09, 2017 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 09, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
March 09, 2017 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 09, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 09, 2017 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.