Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Donald L Warner Jr., in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: April 19, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING | ||
April 19, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EMAIL FROM COUNTY CLERK |
||
April 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
April 19, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
February 22, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
February 22, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQ TO CONVERT TO EFILING |
||
March 04, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
March 04, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVICER CHANGE |
||
March 09, 2018 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LIS PENDENS |
||
December 26, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.