Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Arrow Financial Services, Llc, Chase Bank Usa, Na, Donald Carr Iii, Stanoil Usa Onshore Properties, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management872 days |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions662 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time662 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 27, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CAMPBELL (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
August 24, 2016 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
August 22, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 22, 2016 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
July 12, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 12, 2016 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
June 29, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 27, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 06, 2016 |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL Returned Mail - Donald Carr III |
||
June 03, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.