Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Pine Haven Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Kern, Kenneth Michael, against Jayme Stalker, represented by Thiemann, Kevin B., in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel C Lynch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel C Lynch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
COURT NOTICE
Date: January 25, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 27, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 25, 2024 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Columbia County Supreme Court Clerk's office |
||
December 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
December 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 05, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 27, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 26, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
November 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.