Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Loiselle, Anna L., Zapffe, Carl E, against Brian Schwab, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 06, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 11, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A (Cardmember Agreement for the 6007 Account) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Exhibit B (Cardmember Agreement for the 2008 Account) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 11, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION | ||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 ORDER 01/03/2024 |
||
January 11, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/MAILING |
||
January 04, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 06, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts Redacted |
||
October 06, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.