Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Zapffe, Carl E, against Earl H Lyons, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
March 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
March 07, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 16, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 16, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
February 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - EARL H LYONS |
||
February 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 29, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A (Cardmember Agreement) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.