Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital Cardiology Associates, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jackson, Daniel Colin, Marks, Paul L, against Andrew Mickle, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 | Satisfaction of judgment | ||
November 18, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
December 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment - Default |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of mailing-Summons and complaint |
||
November 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit |
||
September 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Summons and Complaint |
||
September 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.