Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Andrew Gerhardt Jr., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Buono, Anthony Gerard, against Chatham Dental, Pllc, Colin Heeps, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI) | ||
July 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance-Demand for Complaint on behalf of Defendants |
||
July 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 21, 2021 | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.