Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Donald Duksa, Elizabeth Duksa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Rappleyea, Allan B, against The Essell Farms, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15) |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Donald Duksa and Elizabeth Duksa against The Essell Farms, LLC. The plaintiffs are residents of Columbia County, New York, and they are seeking to compel the determination of claims to a specific piece of r...
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 27, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 29, 2021 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT CORRECTED |
||
October 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Corrected Judgment |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental Affirmation |
||
October 21, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Corrected Judgment - proposed |
||
October 21, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.