Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lisa Lynn Hallock Deceased, By And Through Sharon Pitts, As Administrator Of The Estate Of Lisa Lynn Hallock,, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Johnson, Ann R., Lissauer, Lawrence D, against Barnwell Acquisitions Llc, Barnwell Operations Associates Llc D B A The Grand Rehabilitation And Nursing At Barnwell, Eric Rogers, Jeremy Strauss, The Grand Rehabilitation And Nursing At Barnwell, (total of 5) See All represented by Grogan, Elizabeth Janas, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Sara W. Mcginty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara W. Mcginty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nursing Home) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Judge Sara W. McGinty |
||
May 10, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 21, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 23, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Signed Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
August 22, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 19, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Plaintiff's Case Summary |
||
August 19, 2022 | STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 29, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.