Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John Vohrer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Griesemer, Matthew Joseph, against Cheyenne O'Connell, represented by Hurd, Jeffrey Earl, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Sara W. Mcginty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara W. Mcginty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 09, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 15, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Report |
||
November 15, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 04, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) Notice of Motion, Aff ISO Motion, Aff of Service |
||
July 13, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 13, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.