Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Samantha Johnson, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Farstad, Benjamin Carey, against Galvan Initiatives Foundation, Galvan Partners, Llc, represented by Lieberman, Leigh Aree, Parlin, Timothy Boyd, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Koweek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Koweek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (General Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: September 30, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 05, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED "So Ordered Letter Amending Scheduling Order executed 9/5/2023. |
||
August 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
July 06, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT ADR Opt In letter. |
||
May 11, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Richard M. Koweek |
||
May 10, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Remote Status Conference |
||
March 02, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Amended Scheduling Order "So Ordered" on March 1, 2023. |
||
March 01, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 22, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Richard M. Koweek |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.