Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Hudson, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Bernstein, Jonathan Marc, Vanvessem, Matthew C., against Hudson Police, Local 3979, Council 82, represented by Dalbec, Albert Andre, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry F Zwack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Case Cycle Time100 days |
NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 03, 2020ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: August 11, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 28, 2020ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 17, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: August 11, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: May 28, 2020MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: July 21, 2020ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2020PETITION
Date: May 26, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 11, 2020INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: September 03, 2020ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: July 20, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 17, 2020PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: June 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 03, 2020 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
August 31, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 27, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry |
||
August 27, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) Notice of Entry With Decision and Order |
||
August 11, 2020 | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | ||
August 11, 2020 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
August 11, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
August 11, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Screenshot NYSCEF |
||
August 11, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Adminitrative Order AO/114/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.