Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hunt, James T, Kim, Jason, Sussman, David Jeffrey, against Gerda E Veneman, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) CIT31515 |
||
June 15, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
June 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/GERDA E VENEMAN |
||
May 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS |
||
May 20, 2021 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Invoice |
||
September 04, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Gerda E Veneman |
||
September 04, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
March 20, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.