Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Abc Supply Co., Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Centerline Construction, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 18, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: July 24, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | EXECUTION | ||
July 24, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 22, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 22, 2020 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
July 22, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT Compliance Affidvait |
||
June 09, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 18, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
March 18, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a invoice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.