Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Holston, Patrick James, against Darrin J. Gansowski, John Doe #1 Through #12, Said Names Being Fictitious,Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises,And Corporations,Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim,Or May Claim,A Lien Against The Premises,, represented by Sack, Barry David, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry F Zwack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 11, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING *Corrected*
Date: January 28, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 21, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 28, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 30, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 28, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 20, 2020CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: December 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 09, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
||
December 30, 2021 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Affirmation to Cancel Notice of Pendency |
||
March 11, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 10, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 09, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 28, 2020 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
February 28, 2020 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
February 28, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 25, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
February 21, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.