Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jmmj Development Llc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Laurilliard, Kevin, against Dryden Mutual Insurance Company, Phil Martel, Preferred Mutual Insurance Company, Upstate Nygc Llc, represented by Smith, Jay A., Wilson, Joseph Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Sara W. Mcginty presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara W. Mcginty Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Tort) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: October 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 13, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 01, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 14, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
March 24, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
February 03, 2023 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
November 30, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 16, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
November 16, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Conference held 11/16/22 before Judge Zwack |
||
August 25, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Conference held on 8/24/22 |
||
July 21, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.