Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
David Lintner, Karyl Turner, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Slade, Patrick Daniel, against Robert Mickle, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry F Zwack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Tort) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: February 11, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: February 11, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
February 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 09, 2021 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
July 21, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Trial date scheduled for May 16, 2022 |
||
June 15, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 11, 2019 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
February 11, 2019 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.