Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fox, Christine L., Kofman, Harold Leonard, against John Doe, Lawrence C Marshall, represented by Morales Melo, Marlene, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Koweek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Koweek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: May 29, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Richard M. Koweek |
||
May 16, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 12, 2022 |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #1) Order for Summary Judgment and an Order of Reference executed 10/6/2022 |
||
October 04, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 28, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision and Order executed September 28, 2022 |
||
June 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) WebCivil Motion Detail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.