Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with HON. HENRY ZWACK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. HENRY ZWACK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2016 |
CategoryUncontested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2016 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT ZWACK (Court Activity) Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
July 19, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001)
Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
June 05, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001)
Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
May 06, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001)
Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
May 05, 2016 | Motion |
JUDGMENT DIVORCE (Motion #001) Decided: 07/19/2016GRANTED Before Justice: HON. HENRY ZWACK Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
May 05, 2016 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED ZWACK (Court Activity) Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
|
May 05, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001)
Judge: HON. HENRY ZWACK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.