Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Scott J Sorrell, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 30, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 30, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: September 13, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 31, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 31, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Signed Back Page |
||
January 30, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Original Creditor Affidavit |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) SOL |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Debt Buyer Affidavit |
||
January 30, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.