Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rock Creek Capital, Llc As Assignee Of Sallie Mae Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Gallacher, David Joseph, Iannarone, Dolores M, Portnoy, Rachel Elissa, against Patricia E. Dinatale, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 06, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 21, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 09, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
February 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
February 09, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Facts |
||
February 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Facts |
||
September 24, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Additional notice mailed |
||
September 21, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.