Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Akram Gondal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ghuman, Abdul Razzaq, against Musarat Akram, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with William A Favreau presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A Favreau Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED Sealed |
||
December 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Sealed |
||
December 07, 2021 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Sealed |
||
December 07, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Sealed |
||
November 03, 2021 |
SEPARATION AGREEMENT *Corrected* Sealed |
||
September 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
September 29, 2021 |
PART 130 CERTIFICATION Sealed |
||
September 29, 2021 |
CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION *Corrected* Sealed |
||
September 29, 2021 |
RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION Sealed |
||
September 29, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.