Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Glens Falls National Bank And Trust Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Cullum, James Edward, against Melissa A. Burdo, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy Lawliss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Lawliss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 06, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
October 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 06, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 06, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 06, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Retail Instalment Contract |
||
October 06, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service and Mailing |
||
October 06, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.