Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sharon G Larose As Executor Of The Estate Of Dale Larose, Sharon G Larose As Executor Of The Estate Of Dale Larose, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Platt, Jason J., Roman, Jonathan, against Cgsr, Inc., represented by Connors, James Patrick, Giovacco, Katherine A, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy Lawliss presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy Lawliss Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence, Phl2801D, Wd) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 06, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 27, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 03, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 05, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars
Date: November 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 03, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 27, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 27, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response
Date: November 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Correspondence Dated 2/22/2023 - Jury Trial Removed from Calendar - Submit Stip of Discontinuance |
||
January 31, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re: settlement |
||
January 13, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Correspondence Dated 1/13/2023 - Pre Trial Directives |
||
December 22, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Correspondence Dated 12/22/2022 |
||
December 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Decision & Order Upon Motion #1 - Dated 11/9/2022 |
||
November 04, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court to Withdraw Motion |
||
October 27, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Correspondence Dated 10/27/2022 - Request Granted and NOI Deadline Changed |
||
October 25, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request to So Order |
||
September 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) PC Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.