Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jackling, Joseph M, Loiselle, Anna L., Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Jennifer A Garrow, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 09, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry w/Order |
||
November 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Statement for Judgment |
||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Invoice |
||
November 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Military Investigation |
||
October 27, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order - Judgment |
||
September 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
September 08, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.