Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Charles Loscalzo, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 31, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 31, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 31, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
August 31, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AOF |
||
August 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
July 07, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
June 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 30, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.