Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Wray Laporte, represented by Mccann, Thomas H., in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 02, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: June 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (PRE RJI) | ||
September 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
September 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AOF |
||
September 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
September 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
September 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
September 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
June 22, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
June 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.