Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Kenneth Brown, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
August 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 26, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 26, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order |
||
May 06, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Defendant's Answer |
||
May 06, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
||
May 06, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.