Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dhiren Amin As A Member Of Plattsburgh Holiday Inn, Llc, Suing Derivatively In The Right Of Plattsburgh Holiday Inn, Llc, Kokilaben C. Patel As A Member Of Plattsburgh Holiday Inn, Llc, Suing Derivatively In The Right Of Plattsburgh Holiday Inn, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berube, Paula Nadeau, Williams Buettner, Karla Marie, against Alka Patel, Gita Patel, Kumud Patel, Plattsburgh Holiday Inn, Llc, Sanja Patel, (total of 6) See All represented by Davoli, Stephen A, Lippman, Robert Allen, Silverman, Brett Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Derivative) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 15, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 15, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 15, 2022ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: February 28, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 14, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: November 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 14, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 07, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: July 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 07, 2022ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 15, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 01, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 24, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 31, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: June 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 31, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: June 02, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
June 02, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Compliance Conference |
||
June 02, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING And other relief as further described therein |
||
May 31, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
May 31, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 31, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Scheduling Order Based on May 31, 2023 Scheduling Conference |
||
May 30, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 24, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference Adjournment |
||
April 24, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Conference Adjournment |
||
April 21, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.