Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sonia L Leclair, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Anderson, Mark Elton, against Devin J Leclair, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Keith M Bruno presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKeith M Bruno Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedJanuary 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED Sealed Redacted per 22 NYCRR Sealed Redacted |
||
August 26, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE Sealed |
||
August 19, 2021 |
QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER Sealed Redacted per 22 NYCRR Sealed Redacted |
||
August 18, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) Sealed |
||
August 13, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Sealed |
||
August 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF Sealed |
||
August 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
August 12, 2021 |
SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE Sealed |
||
August 12, 2021 |
RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION Sealed |
||
August 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.