Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Harriette Craig Aka Harriette M. Craig, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 09, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
February 05, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 03, 2021 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
January 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 25, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.