Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ets, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Capriotti, David M, against Mtl Cool, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 29, 2020JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 12, 2020 | Affidavit of Mailing pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(3) | ||
November 10, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MTL COOL, INC. - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
November 10, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR FILING |
||
October 29, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
October 29, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A General Staffing Agreement |
||
October 29, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Plaintiff's Accounts Receivable Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.